CO SB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that the director of research of the legislative council convene a working group to conduct an analysis of the state tax system used by the department of revenue, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Tax System Working Group

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-248 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-248 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Legislative Council

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-248
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_248_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_248_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_248_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_248_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_248_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_248_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fe6ea09d8d7ff181872583e000532ff7-sb19-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3b795e4e6247e1f3872583e5004c9e70-sb19-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3b795e4e6247e1f3872583e5004c9e70-sb19-248-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-248vote566b10
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d7ab2985bbc7f25b872583eb00755f2f-sb19-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ed6510ca9654b2f9872583ed004f8a57-sb19-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-248vote595e76

Bill Comments

feedback