CO SB247 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 07/08/2021 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - House Third Reading Laid Over to 07/08/2021 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the procedures of the independent redistricting commissions.
Title
Adjust Redistricting Commission Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-247 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-247 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-247, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 07/08/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/26/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/19/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |