CO SB245 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide State Funding To Map Natural Hazard Areas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide State Funding To Map Natural Hazard Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateGovernor Signed
2015-04-23SenateSent to the Governor
2015-04-22SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-08HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2015-04-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-01SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1/$FILE/245_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1/$FILE/245_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1/$FILE/245_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1/$FILE/245_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1/$FILE/245_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ABF9F124C63B39CE87257E0400702AD1/$FILE/245_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C0A7E204A565B6E387257E200051534E

Bill Comments

feedback