CO SB244 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning funding for permanent part-time legislative aides for members of the general assembly to allow aides to be eligible to enroll in state health benefit plans pursuant to a policy adopted by the executive committee of the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding Health Benefits For Legislative Aides

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 21-244 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-244 to the Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs. (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-244 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-244 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-20HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-17HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 05/19/2021 - No Amendments
2021-05-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-12HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
2021-04-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2021-04-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-244
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_244_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_244_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_244_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_244_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_244_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_244_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB244_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb244_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0244_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0244_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2445a87ba946e54b872586c000506e2c-sb21-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-244vote5816b2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c43f467ed70f6d83872586ce00547a96-sb21-244-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c43f467ed70f6d83872586ce00547a96-sb21-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c1b343b88aa922c872586d1007b29d2-sb21-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-244vote74353a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-244vote74cc29

Bill Comments 750

feedback