CO SB244 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning retail food establishment license fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Food Establishment Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-244 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05 Governor Signed
2017-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-25SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-29SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-27SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-244
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_244_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_244_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_244_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_244_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_244_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_244_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-27t130819z-sb17-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#644
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2017a2017-04-18t133212z-sb17-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2017a2017-04-18t133212z-sb17-244-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1043
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#924

Bill Comments

feedback