CO SB243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a prohibition against a retail food establishment's distribution of an expanded polystyrene product for use as a container for ready-to-eat food intended for off-premises consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit Food Establishments' Use Of Polystyrene

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback