CO SB240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of persons who sell vehicles in the ordinary course of business, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the sunset report of the department of regulatory agencies and making an appropriation.
Title
Sunset Motor Vehicle Dealers Sales
Sponsors
Sen. John Tate [R] | Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-240, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |