CO SB237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creation of the Colorado forest health council in the department of natural resources, and, in connection therewith, repealing the forest health advisory council within the state forest service and making an appropriation.
Title
Create Forest Health Council In Department Of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 21-237 to the Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water. (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 21-237 to the Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water. (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Legislative Council + Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |