CO SB236 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-10)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-10)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the review of medicaid provider rates.
Title
Review Of Medicaid Provider Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-236 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-236 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |