CO SB236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing the capacity of quality early childhood education through grant programs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Increase Capacity Early Childhood Care & Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-236 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-236 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-236, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |