CO SB235 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the Colorado industrial hemp research and development authority.
Title
Colorado Industrial Hemp Research And Development Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: This is a conceptual amendment to amend the printed bill, page 15, strike lines 18 and 19 and substitute a petition clause. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Reconsider (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-235 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: This is a conceptual amendment to amend the printed bill, page 15, strike lines 18 and 19 and substitute a petition clause. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-235, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Reconsider (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |