CO SB233 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning technical modifications to miscellaneous provisions of the "Uniform Election Code of 1992", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections Clean-up

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-233, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Governor Signed
2018-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-26HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2018-04-23SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-233
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_233_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_233_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_233_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_233_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_233_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_233_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-16t133711z-sb18-233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-233vote58e64b
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hsa2018a2018-04-26t120026z-sb18-233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-16t133711z-sb18-233-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2018a2018-04-16t133711z-sb18-233-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-233-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-233-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hsa2018a2018-04-26t120026z-sb18-233-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-233vote5b327e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-233vote14444b
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-233vote143888

Bill Comments

feedback