CO SB232 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the codification of the rules of the secretary of state addressing the procedures for the enforcement of state laws governing campaign finance.
Title
Campaign Finance Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.015) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.018) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.007) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.015) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.018) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.007) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |