CO SB232 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification of the calculation used to determine the amount of money that must be spent to acquire works of art for capital construction projects that are the subject of a lease-purchase agreement.
Title
Calculation For Art In Public Places Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-232 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-232 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |