CO SB231 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the ability of the division of labor standards and statistics in the department of labor and employment to disburse money in the wage theft enforcement fund to employees after an employer fails to make payments determined to be owed to the employees, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend Fund To Allow Payment Overdue Wage Claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-231 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-231 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17 Governor Signed
2023-04-11 Sent to the Governor
2023-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-04-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2023-03-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-29SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-231
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_231_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_231_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_231_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_231_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_231_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_231_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0231_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb231_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0231_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9eb115b0b383a0448725898000511af9-sb23-231-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-231vote5c622a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-231vote5b10dc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/30d4b6ff2894eedf87258986004eaa22-sb23-231-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback