CO SB231 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the Colorado second chance scholarship in the pursuit of higher education for youth previously committed to the division of youth services, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Second Chance Scholarship

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-231 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-231, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-231 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-231
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_231_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_231_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_231_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_231_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_231_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_231_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f70e20fa805e070c872583d9007aaa53-sb19-231-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c818d7e97a418d32872583de00557595-sb19-231-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c818d7e97a418d32872583de00557595-sb19-231-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-231vote6f0ee9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40789a0e5258d499872583e50073566f-sb19-231-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2da71d1615230dd1872583e8004f84e8-sb19-231-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-231vote5eddc8

Bill Comments

feedback