CO SB229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the conditions under which a public trustee shall release a deed of trust.
Title
Release Deed Of Trust Without Evidence Of Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-229 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-229 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |