CO SB229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning failure to exhibit due care when passing vehicles displaying visual signals.
Title
Penalties When Passing Stationary Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Reconsider motion to refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-229 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Reconsider motion to refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1362 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-229 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |