CO SB229 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

ALS Motor Vehicle License Plate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALS Motor Vehicle License Plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 229 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-229 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-229 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-229 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
2015-04-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2015-04-16SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-15SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-14SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-07SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-03-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7194C0318322B26787257DF90065E89F/$FILE/229_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2635185D89FEFE0787257E200078391D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8BDBE338931972BF87257E23004F2ADC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/808A54F3312EF1C487257E23004F4F66
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B0144C1F3170B95387257E36006C74FF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AF8B1CFEFCF5538F87257E37005FBDDD
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F3E7E4A1399B7CF087257E3800791050

Bill Comments

feedback