CO SB228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

concerning the safe use, storage, and disposal of antagonist drugs; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Use Disorders Prevention Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.046) (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.039 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.038 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-228 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.026) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment S). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment R). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment Q). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-228, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-228
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_228_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_228_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_228_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_228_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_228_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_228_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c6c3175672c9bc8872583d900808c6a-sb19-228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97a3a9fb0c9c1c50872583e10058ff6d-sb19-228-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97a3a9fb0c9c1c50872583e10058ff6d-sb19-228-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97a3a9fb0c9c1c50872583e10058ff6d-sb19-228-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97a3a9fb0c9c1c50872583e10058ff6d-sb19-228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97a3a9fb0c9c1c50872583e10058ff6d-sb19-228-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97a3a9fb0c9c1c50872583e10058ff6d-sb19-228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote5b1673
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote573ef0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a61276dacb721104872583eb007f5b02-sb19-228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40550eaf1d6a7c53872583ed004f3f98-sb19-228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40550eaf1d6a7c53872583ed004f3f98-sb19-228-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40550eaf1d6a7c53872583ed004f3f98-sb19-228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40550eaf1d6a7c53872583ed004f3f98-sb19-228-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c6c3175672c9bc8872583d900808c6a-sb19-228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c6c3175672c9bc8872583d900808c6a-sb19-228-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c6c3175672c9bc8872583d900808c6a-sb19-228-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c6c3175672c9bc8872583d900808c6a-sb19-228-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote585cf4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote58719d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote583d19
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote15b22f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-228vote15a22e

Bill Comments

feedback