CO SB228 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive relocation of the laws related to licenses granted by local governments from title 12, Colorado Revised Statutes, as part of the organizational recodification of title 12.
Title
Relocate Title 12 Dance Hall And Escort And Pawnbroker
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Cole Wist [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-228 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-228 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-228 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |