CO SB227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the state emergency reserve, and, in connection therewith, designating the state emergency reserve for the 2021-22 state fiscal year, creating the state emergency reserve cash fund, and requiring reimbursements for expenditures from a fund that is designated as part of the state emergency reserve to be returned to the fund.
Title
State Emergency Reserve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-227 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-227 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-227 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-227 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |