CO SB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition on Colorado's involvement in a state-level climate collaboration that attempts to reduce carbon dioxide emissions.
Title
Prohibit Colorado Involvement Climate Alliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-226 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Postpone Senate Bill 18-226 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-226 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Postpone Senate Bill 18-226 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-226 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |