CO SB225 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of higher education specialty education services funding for the school of medicine partnership operating on the campus of Colorado state university.
Title
Specialty Education Colorado State University Medical School Partnership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-225 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-225 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-225 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-225 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |