CO SB225 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Historical Society Governance
Title
State Historical Society Governance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-225 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-225, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |