CO SB223 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the circumstances under which an autopsy report prepared in connection with the death of a minor may be released to certain parties.
Title
Autopsy Reports Death Of A Minor
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Rep. Terri Carver [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-223, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Governor Vetoed | |
2018-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |