CO SB221 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Social Studies Test Administration
Title
Statewide Social Studies Test Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-221 indefinitely (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 2 of the bill, line 17, after "2013-2014 school year," add "through the 2023-24 school year.", and on page 3, line 2, strike "2015-16" and substitute "2023-24." The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-221 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved a conceptual amendment on page 2 of the bill, line 17, after "2013-2014 school year," add "through the 2023-24 school year.", and on page 3, line 2, strike "2015-16" and substitute "2023-24." The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-221 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |