CO SB220 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-8)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of money previously allocated for public schools, and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Capital Construction Assistance Grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Joint - CC_SB23-220_2023A: Strike from the draft first conference committee report the $10.0 million appropriation to charter schools, strike the language that addresses charter school matching requirements related to the grant process, include staff technical co (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12 Governor Signed
2023-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-27SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2023-04-26HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2023-04-10SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2023-04-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2023-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2023-03-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-29SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-220
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_220_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_220_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_220_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_220_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_220_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_220_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/F9C855EAF1C5F5FB8725897F00630403/SB220_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/743433E6A7686D8B87258988005626C0/SB220_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0220_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb220_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0220_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb220_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb220_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/262c7e622b367deb87258980004f4d5e-sb23-220-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/262c7e622b367deb87258980004f4d5e-sb23-220-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote564c33
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote5e4d76
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5067bcc2034d254187258986004c46da-sb23-220-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote6150f8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote77e3b2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote5a0f4f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote5a2792
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/750e17509cffa7fb872589980068fc0d-sb23-220-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote6241a3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-220vote62525f

Bill Comments

feedback