CO SB220 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provision Of Security For General Assembly

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provision Of Security For General Assembly

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-220 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-18SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-18SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
2015-04-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-17SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-13SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/93796E309ADEE51987257DFD006095E1/$FILE/220_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA96DC2AF52F670587257E26006BD2C5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CCD52D1AA6426E7087257E35006BDA3F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA96DC2AF52F670587257E26006BD2C5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F926741CC1BF0F0087257E26006BCE1C

Bill Comments

feedback