CO SB217 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to enhance law enforcement integrity, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance Law Enforcement Integrity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (Y: 21 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.094) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19 Governor Signed
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-10HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-08SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-04SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-217
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_217_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_217_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_217_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_217_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_217_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_217_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81ac3ba50a0000c08725857d006e6190-sb20-217-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fdf2832d6e11a9788725857f00502cf1-sb20-217-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-217vote5d1136
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-217vote54950d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7fc19f328d29355787258583007340ce-sb20-217-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5c42075bdef291da87258584007e5432-sb20-217-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-217vote1d329b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-217vote7064a7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-217vote6597c5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-217vote67ce70
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5c42075bdef291da87258584007e5432-sb20-217-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81ac3ba50a0000c08725857d006e6190-sb20-217-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81ac3ba50a0000c08725857d006e6190-sb20-217-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81ac3ba50a0000c08725857d006e6190-sb20-217-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81ac3ba50a0000c08725857d006e6190-sb20-217-3-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback