CO SB217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Police Shooting Data Collection
Title
Police Shooting Data Collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the motion to refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the motion to refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |