CO SB215 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the transfer of money from the state employee reserve fund to the general fund to fund monthly housing stipends for department of corrections staff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employee Reserve Fund General Fund Transfer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-215 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-215 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17 Governor Signed
2023-04-13 Sent to the Governor
2023-04-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-04-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-04HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2023-03-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-29SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-03-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-215
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_215_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_215_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_215_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_215_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_215_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_215_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0215_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb215_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0215_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb215_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c5587171332053a287258980004dd3f1-sb23-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-215vote564c22
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-215vote567f0c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4c28d72ecea086887258986004b5a49-sb23-215-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback