CO SB215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the parents encouraging parents conference for parents of children with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parents Encouraging Parents Conference

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-215 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-215 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-215
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_215_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_215_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_215_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_215_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_215_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_215_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c1e196dc7c1d6eb4872583d200713455-sb19-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/60d9268fe8374621872583de00544d0b-sb19-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/60d9268fe8374621872583de00544d0b-sb19-215-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c1e196dc7c1d6eb4872583d200713455-sb19-215-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-215vote5e6341
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/589981faf26f2a08872583e7007aa2da-sb19-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ea9d0f0ecd9c569872583ed007b55e0-sb19-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-215vote734bf6

Bill Comments

feedback