CO SB213 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning transfers from the marijuana cash fund to the marijuana tax cash fund.
Title
Marijuana Cash Fund Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |