CO SB213 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Suspension 2010 Interim Committees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspension 2010 Interim Committees

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-07 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-20 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-19 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-12 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Recede to Senate Adherence
2010-05-11 Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
2010-05-11 House Third Reading Passed
2010-05-10 House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2010-05-10 House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-05-07 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-05-07 Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2010-05-06 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2010-05-05 Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-05-04 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213SA_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DC567D47157D1B9B872576AA00698284/$FILE/213_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E64DBCDE85B3198D8725771A007A8FE2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5531E248F4201EA38725771F005C1E0F

Bill Comments

feedback