CO SB210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the definition of "electronic monitoring services" to include remote supports for the home- and community-based services waiver for the elderly, blind, and disabled.
Title
Remote Supports For Elderly, Blind, And Disabled Waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-210 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-210 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-210 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-210 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |