CO SB209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding small meat processing in Colorado by providing business application assistance to obtain capital, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Meat Processing Grant And Loan Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-209 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-209 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-209 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-209 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |