CO SB209 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the government data advisory board created in the office of information technology.
Title
Modifications To Government Data Advisory Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-209 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-209 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |