CO SB209 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
HOA Mgr Lic Debt Collection Exclude Time Shares
Title
HOA Mgr Lic Debt Collection Exclude Time Shares
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-209 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-209 to the Committee on Business Affairs and Labor (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-209 to the Committee on Business Affairs and Labor (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Business Affairs and Labor |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 4/6/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |