CO SB208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the extension of the period of time that voluntary contributions that are set to expire in 2020 will appear on the state individual tax return form.
Title
Extending Expiring Tax Check-offs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-208 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-208 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-208 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-208 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |