CO SB208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a transfer of money from the state employee reserve fund to the general fund.
Title
State Employee Reserve Fund Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Joint - CC_SB19-208_2019A: Increase transfer from the SERF to the GF by $10 million. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-208 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Joint - CC_SB19-208_2019A: Increase transfer from the SERF to the GF by $10 million. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-208, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-208 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2019-04-16 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |