CO SB208 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dev Disab Referral & Placement Cmt
Title
Dev Disab Referral & Placement Cmt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-208 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-208 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |