CO SB207 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authority for the department of human services to retain amounts from certain cash funds for its indirect costs.
Title
DHS Department Of Human Services Indirect Cost Assessments From Cash Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |