CO SB207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Auricular Acudetox Mental Health Professionals
Title
Auricular Acudetox Mental Health Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 11-2. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |