CO SB206 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the clarification of disqualifying a recipient from participating in a public assistance program when the recipient is found to have committed an intentional violation of the program.
Title
Public Assistance Program Recipient Disqualification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-206 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-206 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-206 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-206 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |