CO SB203 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-15)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an appropriation to the department of agriculture for the Colorado proud program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding For Colorado Proud

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-203 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-203 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-203 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Postpone Senate Bill 21-203 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-203 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
2021-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-203
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_203_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_203_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_203_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_203_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_203_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_203_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb203_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0203_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c71f183b3407dc6c872586c7004fb33a-sb21-203-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-203vote5b47e9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33dfe9daa96e8db8872586d10070cbfe-sb21-203-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2b47492a64e734cb872586bf006ca298-sb21-203-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8c6b557fe32854cb872586e3004e80f6-sb21-203-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-203vote7c76af
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/365da687da88ce14872586bf006b88eb-sb21-203-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2b47492a64e734cb872586bf006ca298-sb21-203-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback