CO SB202 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-11)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a general fund transfer to the public school capital construction assistance fund for the purpose of providing grants for public school air quality improvement projects, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Air Quality Improvement Grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-202 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-202 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Governor Signed
2021-06-10 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2021-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-15SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-202
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_202_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_202_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_202_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_202_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_202_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_202_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB202_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb202_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0202_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb202_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/550019501ec74e9c872586b8006c4a5d-sb21-202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/16d259a5e2a100a6872586c7004fa160-sb21-202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-202vote5b47e1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/be9123f92bdae95c872586db0077af87-sb21-202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7c7aa55403cf5275872586e3004e5914-sb21-202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-202vote7c568d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-202vote5882d9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-202vote588c10
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/be9123f92bdae95c872586db0077af87-sb21-202-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback