CO SB202 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Savings Accounts For Job Retraining
Title
Savings Accounts For Job Retraining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-202 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-202 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |