CO SB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning stricter enforcement for child care facilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Stricter Transparency & Enforcement In Child Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment M). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment M). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |