CO SB198 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Work Comp Insurance Forms Certified Filed With DOI
Title
Work Comp Insurance Forms Certified Filed With DOI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 25 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 25 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | Senate | House Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | Senate | House Recalled Bill From Senate |
2016-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |